SDJR/LMS Fowler "SDJ7F" Class 2-8-0
Class | S&DJR | LMS (1st) | LMS (2nd) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SDJ7F | 80 | 9670 | 13800 | 53800 | 02/1914 | 22C W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/06/1959 |
19/06/1959 |
SDJ7F | 81 | 9671 | 13801 | 53801 | 03/1914 | 22C W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1961 |
19/06/1961 |
SDJ7F | 82 | 9672 | 13802 | 53802 | 03/1914 | 22C W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/03/1960 |
08/03/1960 |
SDJ7F | 83 | 9673 | 13803 | 53803 | 04/1914 | 22C W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/02/1962 |
08/02/1962 |
SDJ7F | 84 | 9674 | 13804 | 53804 | 04/1914 | 22C W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/02/1962 |
08/02/1962 |
SDJ7F | 85 | 9675 | 13805 | 53805 | 08/1914 | 22C W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/03/1961 |
21/03/1961 |
SDJ7F | 86 | 9676 | 13806 | 53806 | 07/1925 | 22C W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/01/1964 |
22/01/1964 |
SDJ7F | 87 | 9677 | 13807 | 53807 | 07/1925 | 22C W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/09/1964 |
07/09/1964 |
SDJ7F | 88 | 9678 | 13808 | 53808 | 07/1925 | 22C W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/03/1964 |
26/02/1964 |
SDJ7F | 89 | 9679 | 13809 | 53809 | 07/1925 | 22C W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/06/1964 |
01/06/1964 |
SDJ7F | 90 | 9680 | 13810 | 53810 | 08/1925 | 22C W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1963 |
18/11/1963 |