Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 2904 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 30083 Week
» 21139 Month
» 367563 Year
» 3394416 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LSWR/SR Drummond "M7" Class 0-4-4T
LSWR |
BR |
BR (Renum) |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
242
|
30242
|
|
03/1897 |
|
08/1958 |
|
61.42 |
|
|
|
61.46 |
243
|
30243
|
|
03/1897 |
|
09/1958 |
|
61.5 |
|
|
|
61.54 |
244
|
30244
|
|
03/1897 |
|
10/1957 |
|
60.58 |
|
|
|
60.71 |
245
|
30245
|
|
04/1897 |
|
17/11/1962 |
|
65.58 |
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
246
|
30246
|
|
04/1897 |
|
28/10/1961 |
|
64.5 |
|
|
|
64.63 |
247
|
30247
|
|
04/1897 |
|
14/10/1961 |
|
64.5 |
|
|
|
64.63 |
248
|
30248
|
|
05/1897 |
|
22/07/1961 |
|
64.17 |
|
|
|
64.29 |
249
|
30249
|
|
05/1897 |
|
07/07/1963 |
|
66.17 |
|
|
|
66.96 |
250
|
30250
|
|
05/1897 |
|
31/08/1957 |
|
60.25 |
|
|
|
60.71 |
251
|
30251
|
|
06/1897 |
|
07/07/1963 |
|
66.08 |
|
|
|
66.21 |
252
|
30252
|
|
08/1897 |
|
07/02/1959 |
|
61.5 |
|
|
|
61.62 |
253
|
30253
|
|
08/1897 |
|
07/10/1961 |
|
64.17 |
|
|
|
70.38 |
254
|
30254
|
|
08/1897 |
|
10/05/1964 |
|
66.75 |
|
|
|
67.21 |
255
|
30255
|
|
08/1897 |
|
10/09/1960 |
|
63.08 |
|
|
|
63.21 |
256
|
30256
|
|
08/1897 |
|
23/05/1959 |
|
61.75 |
|
|
|
61.95 |
667
|
30667
|
30106
|
09/1897 |
|
25/02/1961 |
|
63.42 |
|
|
|
63.46 |
668
|
30668
|
|
09/1897 |
|
09/09/1961 |
|
64 |
|
|
|
64.29 |
669
|
30669
|
|
09/1897 |
|
22/07/1961 |
|
63.83 |
|
|
|
64.04 |
670
|
30670
|
|
10/1897 |
|
30/03/1963 |
|
65.42 |
|
|
|
65.62 |
671
|
30671
|
|
10/1897 |
|
11/07/1959 |
|
61.75 |
|
|
|
61.87 |
672
|
30672
|
|
10/1897 |
|
29/05/1948 |
|
50.58 |
|
|
|
50.61 |
673
|
30673
|
|
11/1897 |
|
06/08/1960 |
|
62.75 |
|
|
|
62.37 |
674
|
30674
|
|
11/1897 |
|
26/08/1961 |
|
63.75 |
|
|
|
63.96 |
675
|
30675
|
|
11/1897 |
|
22/03/1958 |
|
60.33 |
|
|
|
60.37 |
676
|
30676
|
|
11/1897 |
|
22/07/1961 |
|
63.67 |
|
|
|
63.79 |
31
|
30031
|
30128
|
03/1898 |
|
07/01/1961 |
|
62.83 |
|
|
|
62.96 |
32
|
30032
|
|
03/1898 |
|
07/07/1963 |
|
65.33 |
|
|
|
66.30 |
33
|
30033
|
|
04/1898 |
|
22/12/1962 |
|
64.67 |
|
|
|
65.04 |
34
|
30034
|
|
04/1898 |
|
17/02/1963 |
|
64.83 |
|
|
|
65.12 |
35
|
30035
|
|
04/1898 |
|
17/02/1963 |
|
64.83 |
|
|
|
66.21 |
36
|
30036
|
|
05/1898 |
|
12/01/1964 |
|
65.67 |
|
|
|
66.30 |
37
|
30037
|
|
05/1898 |
|
31/05/1958 |
|
60 |
|
|
|
60.12 |
38
|
30038
|
|
05/1898 |
|
02/1958 |
|
59.75 |
|
|
|
59.87 |
39
|
30039
|
|
05/1898 |
|
02/03/1963 |
|
64.83 |
|
|
|
65.04 |
40
|
30040
|
|
06/1898 |
|
10/06/1961 |
|
63 |
|
|
|
63.04 |
22
|
30022
|
|
01/1899 |
|
17/05/1958 |
|
59.33 |
|
|
|
59.37 |
23
|
30023
|
|
01/1899 |
|
07/10/1961 |
|
62.75 |
|
|
|
62.87 |
24
|
30024
|
|
01/1899 |
|
03/03/1963 |
|
64.17 |
|
|
|
64.37 |
25
|
30025
|
|
02/1899 |
|
10/05/1964 |
|
65.25 |
|
|
|
65.71 |
26
|
30026
|
|
02/1899 |
|
04/1959 |
|
60.17 |
|
|
|
60.45 |
41
|
30041
|
|
03/1899 |
|
31/08/1957 |
|
58.42 |
|
|
|
58.54 |
42
|
30042
|
|
03/1899 |
|
08/06/1957 |
|
58.25 |
|
|
|
58.29 |
43
|
30043
|
|
03/1899 |
|
05/1961 |
|
62.17 |
|
|
|
62.38 |
44
|
30044
|
|
03/1899 |
|
09/09/1961 |
|
62.5 |
|
|
|
62.63 |
241
|
30241
|
|
05/1899 |
|
07/07/1963 |
|
64.17 |
|
|
|
64.46 |
112
|
30112
|
|
07/1900 |
|
02/02/1963 |
|
62.58 |
|
|
|
62.79 |
318
|
30318
|
|
08/1900 |
|
19/12/1959 |
|
59.33 |
|
|
|
59.46 |
319
|
30319
|
|
08/1900 |
|
23/01/1960 |
|
59.42 |
|
|
|
59.54 |
320
|
30320
|
|
08/1900 |
|
02/03/1963 |
|
62.58 |
|
|
|
63.71 |
321
|
30321
|
|
08/1900 |
|
29/09/1962 |
|
62.08 |
|
|
|
62.29 |
322
|
30322
|
|
08/1900 |
|
22/11/1958 |
|
58.25 |
|
|
|
58.37 |
323
|
30323
|
|
10/1900 |
|
19/12/1959 |
|
59.17 |
|
|
|
59.21 |
324
|
30324
|
|
10/1900 |
|
12/09/1959 |
|
58.92 |
|
|
|
59.04 |
356
|
30356
|
|
10/1900 |
|
06/12/1958 |
|
58.17 |
|
|
|
58.21 |
357
|
30357
|
|
10/1900 |
|
29/04/1961 |
|
60.5 |
|
|
|
60.71 |
123
|
30123
|
|
02/1903 |
|
06/1959 |
|
56.33 |
|
|
|
56.53 |
124
|
30124
|
|
02/1903 |
|
20/05/1961 |
|
58.25 |
|
|
|
58.37 |
130
|
30130
|
|
02/1903 |
|
12/12/1959 |
|
56.83 |
|
|
|
56.87 |
132
|
30132
|
|
03/1903 |
|
27/10/1962 |
|
59.58 |
|
|
|
59.79 |
133
|
30133
|
|
03/1903 |
|
15/03/1964 |
|
61 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
11/1965 |
62.72 |
374
|
30374
|
|
04/1903 |
|
10/10/1959 |
|
56.5 |
|
|
|
56.54 |
375
|
30375
|
|
05/1903 |
|
22/09/1962 |
|
59.33 |
|
|
|
59.46 |
376
|
30376
|
|
05/1903 |
|
10/01/1959 |
|
55.67 |
|
|
|
55.87 |
377
|
30377
|
|
05/1903 |
|
18/08/1962 |
|
59.25 |
|
|
|
59.38 |
378
|
30378
|
|
05/1903 |
|
30/12/1962 |
|
59.58 |
|
|
|
59.96 |
21
|
30021
|
|
01/1904 |
|
15/03/1964 |
|
60.17 |
|
|
|
60.54 |
27
|
30027
|
|
01/1904 |
|
21/11/1959 |
|
55.83 |
|
|
|
55.95 |
28
|
30028
|
|
01/1904 |
|
29/09/1962 |
|
58.67 |
|
|
|
58.79 |
29
|
30029
|
|
02/1904 |
|
17/05/1964 |
|
60.25 |
|
|
|
60.71 |
30
|
30030
|
|
02/1904 |
|
17/10/1959 |
|
55.67 |
|
|
|
55.79 |
108
|
30108
|
|
03/1904 |
|
17/05/1964 |
|
60.17 |
|
|
|
60.63 |
109
|
30109
|
|
03/1904 |
|
06/1961 |
|
57.25 |
|
|
|
57.46 |
110
|
30110
|
|
03/1904 |
|
18/05/1963 |
|
59.17 |
|
|
|
59.21 |
111
|
30111
|
|
03/1904 |
|
05/01/1964 |
|
59.83 |
|
|
|
60.63 |
379
|
30379
|
|
06/1904 |
|
06/10/1963 |
|
59.33 |
|
|
|
59.46 |
104
|
30104
|
|
03/1905 |
|
13/05/1961 |
|
56.17 |
|
|
|
56.29 |
105
|
30105
|
|
03/1905 |
|
01/06/1963 |
|
58.25 |
|
|
|
58.29 |
106
|
30106
|
30667
|
03/1905 |
|
19/11/1960 |
|
55.67 |
|
|
|
59.63 |
107
|
30107
|
|
04/1905 |
|
17/05/1964 |
|
59.08 |
|
|
|
59.54 |
45
|
30045
|
|
05/1905 |
|
08/12/1962 |
|
57.58 |
|
|
|
57.87 |
46
|
30046
|
|
05/1905 |
|
07/02/1959 |
|
53.75 |
|
|
|
53.95 |
47
|
30047
|
|
05/1905 |
|
06/02/1960 |
|
54.75 |
|
|
|
54.79 |
48
|
30048
|
|
05/1905 |
|
05/01/1964 |
|
58.67 |
|
|
|
59.21 |
49
|
30049
|
|
05/1905 |
|
02/06/1962 |
|
57.08 |
|
|
|
57.12 |
50
|
30050
|
|
06/1905 |
|
27/01/1962 |
|
56.58 |
|
|
|
56.71 |
51
|
30051
|
|
11/1905 |
|
29/09/1962 |
|
56.83 |
|
|
|
57.04 |
52
|
30052
|
|
12/1905 |
|
17/05/1964 |
|
58.42 |
|
|
|
58.87 |
53
|
30053
|
|
12/1905 |
|
17/05/1964 |
|
58.42 |
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
54
|
30054
|
|
12/1905 |
|
10/01/1959 |
|
53.08 |
|
|
|
53.21 |
55
|
30055
|
|
12/1905 |
|
15/09/1963 |
|
57.75 |
|
|
|
58.21 |
56
|
30056
|
|
01/1906 |
|
08/12/1963 |
|
57.92 |
|
|
|
57.95 |
57
|
30057
|
|
01/1906 |
|
23/06/1963 |
|
57.42 |
|
|
|
57.53 |
58
|
30058
|
|
03/1906 |
|
24/09/1960 |
|
54.5 |
|
|
|
54.62 |
59
|
30059
|
|
03/1906 |
|
25/02/1961 |
|
54.92 |
|
|
|
56.21 |
60
|
30060
|
|
03/1906 |
|
22/07/1961 |
|
55.33 |
|
|
|
55.54 |
125
|
30125
|
|
06/1911 |
|
30/12/1962 |
|
51.5 |
|
|
|
52.71 |
126
|
|
|
08/1911 |
|
05/1937 |
|
25.75 |
|
|
|
|
127
|
30127
|
|
10/1911 |
|
10/11/1963 |
|
52.08 |
|
|
|
52.12 |
128
|
30128
|
30031
|
11/1911 |
|
01/06/1963 |
|
51.58 |
|
|
|
51.53 |
129
|
30129
|
|
11/1911 |
|
17/11/1963 |
|
52 |
|
|
|
52.12 |
131
|
30131
|
|
11/1911 |
|
01/12/1962 |
|
51.08 |
|
|
|
51.12 |
328
|
30328
|
|
11/1911 |
|
03/03/1963 |
|
51.33 |
|
|
|
51.62 |
479
|
30479
|
|
11/1911 |
|
22/04/1961 |
|
49.42 |
|
|
|
49.53 |
480
|
30480
|
|
11/1911 |
|
17/05/1964 |
|
52.5 |
|
|
|
52.95 |
481
|
30481
|
|
11/1911 |
|
30/05/1959 |
|
47.5 |
|
|
|
47.61 |