Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3022 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33672 Week
» 132317 Month
» 334981 Year
» 3361834 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and South Western Railway |
59 |
m/e |
03/1906 |
British Railways |
30059 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
M7 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
Order Number |
D13 |
To Service |
During 03/1906 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 25/02/1961 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 11 mths , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1906 |
To Service |
To service as London and South Western Railway Number 59 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30059 |
|
|
21/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) |
|
|
20/04/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
25/02/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30059 |
|
|
05/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|