SR Stroudley "D1M" Class 0-4-2T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2215 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2234 | EBN | Eastbourne | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2235 | BTN | Brighton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2239 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2252 | HOR | Horsham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2253 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2259 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2269 | FRA | Fratton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2274 | EBN | Eastbourne | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2283 | HOR | Horsham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2289 | HOR | Horsham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2299 | AFD | Ashford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2358 | EBN | Eastbourne | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2361 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2605 | EBN | Eastbourne | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2699 | ELH | Eastleigh | |||
02/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2289 | HOR | Horsham | HOR | Horsham | |
02/1948 | Condemned | 2699 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
03/1948 | Condemned | 2239 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
03/1948 | Condemned | 2259 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
03/1948 | Condemned | 2361 | ELH | Eastleigh | COND | ||
07/1948 | Condemned | 2269 | FRA | Fratton | COND | ||
07/1948 | Condemned | 2289 | HOR | Horsham | COND | ||
11/1948 | Condemned | 2283 | HOR | Horsham | COND | ||
11/1948 | Condemned | 2358 | EBN | Eastbourne | COND | ||
11/1948 | Condemned | 2605 | EBN | Eastbourne | COND | ||
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 32253 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | BTN | Brighton | |
05/1949 | Condemned | 32235 | BTN | Brighton | COND | ||
05/1949 | Condemned | 32299 | AFD | Ashford | COND | ||
05/1949 | Condemned | D700S | COND | ||||
03/05/1949 | Reallocation | 32253 | BTN | Brighton | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | |
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 32253 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | |
31/07/1949 | Reallocation | 32253 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | BTN | Brighton | |
09/1949 | Condemned | 32253 | BTN | Brighton | COND | ||
02/1950 | Condemned | 32215 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | COND | ||
02/1950 | Condemned | 32234 | EBN | Eastbourne | COND | ||
02/1950 | Condemned | 32274 | EBN | Eastbourne | COND | ||
09/1950 | Condemned | 32252 | HOR | Horsham | COND |