Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1649 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19452 Week
» 72468 Month
» 191995 Year
» 3218848 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2235 |
m/e |
11/1881 |
British Railways |
32235 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stroudley |
Class |
D1M |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-2T |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During 11/1881 |
Withdrawal |
During 05/1949 |
Service Life |
67 yrs, 5 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1881 |
BTN |
|
Brighton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
05/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BTN |
Brighton |
m/e |
30/11/1946 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
01/06/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1947 |
Brighton Works |
Some of the 'Pacifics' of the 'West Country' or 'Battle of Britain' Class have recently been noted outside Brighton Works with names with the Air Force motto in oval frame underneath: Nos. 21C153 Sir Keith Park; 21C165 Hurricane; 21C166 Spitfire and 21C167 Tangmere. Later the names were covered, presumably for an official ceremony similar to those mentioned in the daily Press, e.g., 21C151 Winston Churchill; 21C152 Lord Dowding; 21C164 Fighter Command etc. The Kent & East Sussex 'Terrier' No. KES3 (ex L.B. & S.C.R. No. 70 Poplar) which entered Brighton Works at the end of April came out on September 13th painted green with black border and yellow lining. The Stroudley combined sandbox and splasher is retained but the engine is otherwise externally similar to the 'AIX' but without the rear toolbox. The copper top of the chimney is painted black. 'Austerity' No. 77037 has also recently been repaired and painted unlined black. Noteworthy engines in shops on 13/9 were: Nos. 2004, 2021, 2039, 2252 , also 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 70878 (Nimes), 77007 (Hazebrouk), 77094 (Creil), 77122 (Acheres), 77150 (Dunkerque) and 77286 (Huizen), and the last three of the 'West Country' Pacifics, the current order finishing at 21C170 . No. 2235 is used to supply steam for boiler test in place of 2255 withdrawn. Boxhill left Brighton under her own steam for Horsham on 3/9 and has since been reported in London. |
SLS/194710 |
10/06/1950 |
Brighton Works |
On the occasion of the Works visit on Saturday, 10th June, the following were noted: e20001 (new livery), 31295 (lined), 31706, 32460, 34045 Ottery St. Mary, 34074, 34082 615 Squadron (30)272, 32636 (lined, waiting boiler), 42096 (tanks being fitted), 42097 (boiler in), frames up to 42102, frames of 34110, 77108/90570 (V.F.4924/43), 77359/90207, 90702, 77030/90127, and the works shunters 377S an 2235. Diesel 15203 was still outside after repair and repaint. The transfer of the 'W.D. 8F' proceeds apace; they were most useful on the Southern Region for maintaining quick goods working between the frequent passenger services (mostly electric), as they had a good turn of speed;, and they were used on empty stock and mixed trains. |
SLS/195007 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1881 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2235 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Brighton (BTN) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 32235 but not taken up |
|
|
05/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2235 |
|
|
02/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|