02 0-4-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/10/1960 | To Service | 2851 | NEW | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
06/10/1960 | To Service | 2850 | NEW | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
14/10/1960 | To Service | 2852 | NEW | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
25/10/1960 | To Service | 2853 | NEW | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
04/11/1960 | To Service | 2854 | NEW | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
21/11/1960 | To Service | 2855 | NEW | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
02/12/1960 | To Service | 2856 | NEW | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
04/12/1960 | To Service | 2857 | NEW | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
21/12/1960 | To Service | 2858 | NEW | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
30/12/1960 | To Service | 2859 | NEW | 17B | Burton | ||
13/09/1961 | To Service | 2860 | NEW | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
03/10/1961 | To Service | 2861 | NEW | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
14/10/1961 | To Service | 2862 | NEW | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
18/10/1961 | To Service | 2863 | NEW | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
25/10/1961 | To Service | 2864 | NEW | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
01/11/1961 | To Service | 2865 | NEW | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
10/11/1961 | To Service | 2866 | NEW | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
17/11/1961 | To Service | 2867 | NEW | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
27/11/1961 | To Service | 2868 | NEW | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
04/12/1961 | To Service | 2869 | NEW | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
15/06/1963 | Reallocation | 2866 | 27A | Bank Hall | 26B | Agecroft | |
20/07/1963 | Reallocation | 2858 | 26A | Newton Heath | 27A | Bank Hall | |
20/07/1963 | Reallocation | 2869 | 27A | Bank Hall | 26A | Newton Heath | |
27/07/1963 | Reallocation | 2864 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 26A | Newton Heath | |
27/07/1963 | Reallocation | 2865 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 26A | Newton Heath | |
24/08/1963 | Reallocation | 2865 | 26A | Newton Heath | 9G | Gorton | |
19/10/1963 | Reallocation | 2866 | 26B | Agecroft | 9D | Newton Heath | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 2865 | 9G | Gorton | 9D | Newton Heath | |
09/11/1963 | Reallocation | 2867 | 27A | Bank Hall | 9D | Newton Heath | |
22/08/1964 | Reallocation | 2868 | 27A | Bank Hall | 10C | Fleetwood | |
26/09/1964 | Reallocation | 2859 | 17B | Burton | 16C | Derby | |
10/10/1964 | Reallocation | 2859 | 16C | Derby | 9D | Newton Heath | |
10/10/1964 | Reallocation | 2862 | 24F | Fleetwood | 10D | Lostock Hall | |
10/10/1964 | Reallocation | 2868 | 10C | Fleetwood | 10D | Lostock Hall | |
17/10/1964 | Reallocation | 2867 | 9D | Newton Heath | 10C | Fleetwood | |
27/03/1965 | Reallocation | 2867 | 10C | Fleetwood | 10D | Lostock Hall | |
19/02/1966 | Reallocation | 2860 | 24F | Fleetwood | 10D | Lostock Hall | |
19/02/1966 | Reallocation | 2861 | 24F | Fleetwood | 10D | Lostock Hall | |
19/02/1966 | Reallocation | 2863 | 24F | Fleetwood | 10D | Lostock Hall | |
18/06/1966 | Reallocation | 2860 | 10D | Lostock Hall | 8K | Bank Hall | |
22/10/1966 | Reallocation | 2850 | 27A | Bank Hall | 8C | Speke Junction | |
22/10/1966 | Reallocation | 2851 | 27A | Bank Hall | 8C | Speke Junction | |
22/10/1966 | Reallocation | 2852 | 27A | Bank Hall | 8C | Speke Junction | |
22/10/1966 | Reallocation | 2853 | 27A | Bank Hall | 8C | Speke Junction | |
22/10/1966 | Reallocation | 2854 | 27A | Bank Hall | 8C | Speke Junction | |
22/10/1966 | Reallocation | 2855 | 27A | Bank Hall | 8C | Speke Junction | |
22/10/1966 | Reallocation | 2856 | 27A | Bank Hall | 8C | Speke Junction | |
22/10/1966 | Reallocation | 2857 | 27A | Bank Hall | 8C | Speke Junction | |
22/10/1966 | Reallocation | 2858 | 27A | Bank Hall | 8C | Speke Junction | |
22/10/1966 | Reallocation | 2860 | 8K | Bank Hall | 8C | Speke Junction | |
22/10/1966 | Reallocation | 2867 | 10D | Lostock Hall | 8C | Speke Junction | |
22/07/1967 | Reallocation | 2859 | 9D | Newton Heath | 50D | Goole | |
22/07/1967 | Reallocation | 2865 | 9D | Newton Heath | 50D | Goole | |
06/01/1968 | Reallocation | 2858 | 8C | Speke Junction | 9D | Newton Heath | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 2850 | 8C | Speke Junction | 8J | Allerton | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 2851 | 8C | Speke Junction | 8J | Allerton | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 2852 | 8C | Speke Junction | 8J | Allerton | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 2853 | 8C | Speke Junction | 8J | Allerton | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 2854 | 8C | Speke Junction | 8J | Allerton | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 2855 | 8C | Speke Junction | 8J | Allerton | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 2856 | 8C | Speke Junction | 8J | Allerton | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 2857 | 8C | Speke Junction | 8J | Allerton | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 2860 | 8C | Speke Junction | 8J | Allerton | |
11/05/1968 | Reallocation | 2867 | 8C | Speke Junction | 8J | Allerton | |
06/07/1968 | Reallocation | 2858 | 9D | Newton Heath | 9A | Longsight | |
06/07/1968 | Reallocation | 2864 | 26A | Newton Heath | 9A | Longsight | |
06/07/1968 | Reallocation | 2866 | 9D | Newton Heath | 9A | Longsight | |
06/07/1968 | Reallocation | 2869 | 26A | Newton Heath | 9A | Longsight | |
13/09/1969 | Reallocation | 2868 | 98S | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
27/12/1969 | Reallocation | 2857 | 98S | 8J | Allerton | ||
31/12/1969 | Condemned | 2861 | 98S | COND | |||
31/12/1969 | Condemned | 2862 | 98S | COND | |||
31/12/1969 | Condemned | 2863 | 98S | COND | |||
31/12/1969 | Condemned | 2868 | 98S | COND | |||
31/12/1969 | Condemned | 2869 | 98S | COND | |||
21/02/1970 | Reallocation | 2857 | 98S | 8J | Allerton | ||
28/02/1970 | Condemned | 2854 | 98S | COND | |||
28/02/1970 | Condemned | 2858 | 9A | Longsight | COND | ||
28/02/1970 | Condemned | 2864 | 9A | Longsight | COND | ||
28/02/1970 | Condemned | 2866 | 9A | Longsight | COND | ||
15/03/1970 | Condemned | 2859 | 50D | Goole | COND | ||
15/03/1970 | Condemned | 2865 | 50D | Goole | COND | ||
06/06/1970 | Reallocation | 2850 | 98S | 8J | Allerton | ||
06/06/1970 | Reallocation | 2855 | 98S | 8J | Allerton | ||
06/06/1970 | Reallocation | 2860 | 98S | 8J | Allerton | ||
06/06/1970 | Reallocation | 2867 | 8J | Allerton | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
20/06/1970 | Condemned | 2850 | 8J | Allerton | COND | ||
22/08/1970 | Reallocation | 2867 | O/L | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
12/09/1970 | Condemned | 2867 | 6A | Chester (MR) | COND | ||
04/10/1970 | Condemned | 2855 | 8J | Allerton | COND | ||
13/12/1970 | Condemned | 2860 | 8J | Allerton | COND | ||
18/04/1971 | Condemned | 2857 | 8J | Allerton | COND | ||
14/10/1973 | Condemned | 02002 | 98W | COND | |||
01/06/1975 | Condemned | 02001 | 98S | COND | |||
01/06/1975 | Condemned | 02003 | 8J | Allerton | COND | ||
01/06/1975 | Condemned | 02004 | 8J | Allerton | COND |