Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3063 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 30242 Week
» 21298 Month
» 367722 Year
» 3394575 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2717
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5058 |
NEWPORT CASTLE |
19/05/1937 |
Castle |
5091 |
CLEEVE ABBEY |
02/08/1941 |
Castle |
4089 |
DONNINGTON CASTLE |
22/10/1945 |
Castle |
5072 |
HURRICANE |
27/08/1946 |
Castle |
4088 |
DARTMOUTH CASTLE |
07/01/1948 |
Castle |
5071 |
SPITFIRE |
19/10/1948 |
Castle |
5003 |
LULWORTH CASTLE |
27/02/1951 |
Castle |
5041 |
TIVERTON CASTLE |
26/02/1952 |
Castle |
5044 |
EARL OF DUNRAVEN |
26/02/1952 |
Castle |
5009 |
SHREWSBURY CASTLE |
05/11/1953 |
Castle |
7035 |
OGMORE CASTLE |
26/07/1955 |
Castle |
5088 |
LLANTHONY ABBEY |
10/06/1958 |
|