Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1445 Today
» 3791 Yesterday
» 10389 Week
» 1445 Month
» 347869 Year
» 3374722 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2428
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5029 |
NUNNEY CASTLE |
17/11/1934 |
Castle |
4078 |
PEMBROKE CASTLE |
01/07/1939 |
Castle |
5070 |
SIR DANIEL GOOCH |
04/12/1942 |
Castle |
4075 |
CARDIFF CASTLE |
14/04/1947 |
Castle |
5084 |
READING ABBEY |
17/09/1948 |
Castle |
5069 |
ISAMBARD KINGDOM BRUNEL |
13/05/1949 |
Castle |
5004 |
LLANSTEPHAN CASTLE |
20/10/1950 |
Castle |
4080 |
POWDERHAM CASTLE |
02/08/1951 |
Castle |
4099 |
KILGERRAN CASTLE |
04/01/1952 |
Castle |
5009 |
SHREWSBURY CASTLE |
17/07/1952 |
Castle |
5060 |
EARL OF BERKELEY |
13/10/1952 |
Castle |
4089 |
DONNINGTON CASTLE |
04/08/1953 |
Castle |
5093 |
UPTON CASTLE |
10/08/1954 |
Castle |
5056 |
EARL OF POWIS |
11/01/1955 |
|