Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1741 Today
» 4203 Yesterday
» 23160 Week
» 46131 Month
» 392555 Year
» 3419408 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2594
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5000 |
LAUNCESTON CASTLE |
29/03/1939 |
Castle |
4076 |
CARMARTHEN CASTLE |
12/06/1940 |
Castle |
5032 |
USK CASTLE |
19/06/1942 |
Castle |
5049 |
EARL OF PLYMOUTH |
03/07/1944 |
Castle |
5018 |
ST MAWES CASTLE |
04/12/1954 |
Castle |
5015 |
KINGSWEAR CASTLE |
30/06/1955 |
Castle |
5015 |
KINGSWEAR CASTLE |
30/07/1955 |
Castle |
5034 |
CORFE CASTLE |
12/02/1957 |
Castle |
7034 |
INCE CASTLE |
23/03/1957 |
Castle |
5029 |
NUNNEY CASTLE |
24/04/1959 |
|