Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1962 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 13177 Week
» 4233 Month
» 350657 Year
» 3377510 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #2381
Pre Grouping Company |
NER |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
55Sup |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A7 |
1126 |
|
16/10/1931 |
A7 |
1190 |
|
06/02/1935 |
A7 |
1129 |
|
21/11/1938 |
A7 |
1193 |
|
31/10/1941 |
A7 |
9781 |
|
04/05/1946 |
A7 |
69776 |
|
05/11/1948 |
|