|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 1917 | 09/1917 | General | Boiler number G915 (Diagram 55Sat) |
|||
Darlington Works | 1918 | 11/1918 | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number G912(ex (Diagram 55Sup) Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1924 | 10/04/1924 | 87 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1925 | 16/09/1925 | 78 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/04/1926 | 16/04/1926 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1928 | 16/11/1928 | 78 days | General | Boiler number D2050 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1931 | 19/01/1932 | 58 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/12/1934 | 06/02/1935 | 58 days | General | Sanding altered Boiler number 2381 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/12/1937 | 16/02/1938 | 59 days | General | Boiler number D2049 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/07/1940 | 07/01/1941 | 164 days | General | Boiler number D611 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/07/1942 | 07/08/1942 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 30/07/1943 | 18/09/1943 | 51 days | General | Rebuilt To Part 1 Boiler number 3358 (Diagram 63BSup) Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 |
||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1944 | 25/03/1944 | 32 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 29/01/1947 | 15/03/1947 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1949 | 08/10/1949 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24737 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69785 |
||
Darlington Works | 23/04/1952 | 17/05/1952 | 25 days | Light Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/10/1955 | York | An unusual visitor to York in October was 73051 (71G) which worked the 4.15 p.m. stopping passenger train from York to Sheffield (Midland) on 11/10/55. (This is normally a Saltley or Bournville Stanier Class 5 turn.) On 19/10/55 ex-works (Darlington) B1s at York shed were 61110 (37A) and 61229 (37C). On 7/11/55 42860 (26B) worked the 10.10 a.m. York to Manchester (Victoria) and 5.10 p.m. Manchester (Victoria) to York instead of the usual York B1. N5 No. 69357 (36B) was in York shed on 9/11/55, and on 15/11/55 A7 No. 69785 (53C) was in the shed yard en route for Darlington works. On 17/11/55 York had quite a Great Central appearance with 69275 (40A) in the shed and 69256 (40F), 69278 (36D), 69303 (36D), and 69310 (38A) in the shed yard, all in steam, and some marked in chalk 'For Darlington plant'. Another most unusual visitor, both as regards type and shed, on the same day was 7F 0-8-0 49648 (25E). | SLS/195512 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1911 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1190 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Stockton (SKN) Diagram 55Sat boiler fitted |
||
1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: ?/09/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number G915 (Diagram 55Sat) |
||
1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1918. Dep: ?/11/1918. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number G912(ex (Diagram 55Sup) Superheated boiler fitted |
||
15/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1924. Dep: 10/04/1924. | ||
01/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1925. Dep: 16/09/1925. | ||
26/02/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
01/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/04/1926. Dep: 16/04/1926. | ||
01/09/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
21/10/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
31/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1928. Dep: 16/11/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2050 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
23/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1931. Dep: 19/01/1932. | ||
11/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1934. Dep: 06/02/1935. Work undertaken: Sanding altered Boiler number 2381 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
20/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1937. Dep: 16/02/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2049 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
28/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1940. Dep: 07/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number D611 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
08/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
23/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/07/1942. Dep: 07/08/1942. | ||
23/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
30/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1943. Dep: 18/09/1943. Work undertaken: Rebuilt To Part 1 Boiler number 3358 (Diagram 63BSup) Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 |
||
23/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/02/1944. Dep: 25/03/1944. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
12/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
14/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9785 | ||
29/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1947. Dep: 15/03/1947. | ||
12/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1949. Dep: 08/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24737 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69785 |
||
23/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 23/04/1952. Dep: 17/05/1952. | ||
17/11/1955 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69785 from Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
12/1955 | Scrapped | Scrapped |