Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 631 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31281 Week
» 129926 Month
» 332590 Year
» 3359443 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #10594/29856
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
118 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A1 |
60157 |
|
03/11/1949 |
A2 |
60515 |
SUN STREAM |
02/03/1953 |
A1 |
60135 |
MADGE WILDFIRE |
31/08/1954 |
A1 |
60124 |
KENILWORTH |
19/10/1956 |
A1 |
60149 |
AMADIS |
11/06/1958 |
A1 |
60115 |
MEG MERRILIES |
15/01/1960 |
|