|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 20/06/1949 | 23/06/1949 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/09/1949 | 10/10/1949 | 12 days | Light Casual | ATC fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/04/1950 | 18/04/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1950 | 20/10/1950 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29807 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1951 | 16/08/1951 | 35 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1952 | 04/04/1952 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/09/1952 | 31/10/1952 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29822 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/07/1953 | 22/07/1953 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/10/1953 | 24/11/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29826 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/12/1953 | 22/12/1953 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/01/1955 | 17/01/1955 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/03/1955 | 10/05/1955 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29785 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/05/1956 | 11/05/1956 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/07/1956 | 23/08/1956 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29870 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/07/1957 | 10/07/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/05/1958 | 11/06/1958 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 10594 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1958 | 07/11/1958 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1959 | 31/12/1959 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29875 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/05/1960 | 01/07/1960 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/09/1960 | 18/10/1960 | 40 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1961 | 22/12/1961 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29823 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/04/1963 | 11/04/1963 | 1 day | Weighing |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1949 | Darlington Works | New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. | SLS/194907 |
31/12/1950 | Miscellaneous | Newly-named 'Al' are Nos. 60136 Alcazar and 60149 Amadis. A 'Claud' has worked the Cambridge and Garden Cities buffet-car trains into King's Cross at 1.40 p.m., and so has an 'Ll' 2-6-4T. | SLS/195102 |
12/11/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Crimpsall) | New Erecting Shop: 13166, D8239, E3069-75; Outside New Erecting Shop: D5583, 61042, 61317, 73000/165. Stripping Road: 60015, 63973/87, 70041. Crimpsal: D3646. 43151, 60108; Outside Crimpsall: 60003/29/149, 73024 (89A). Erecting Shop: D3153, D3447/8, D3476-8, D5520, D5609/37/66, D5802, 43160, 60023/65/127/525, 70000/8, 73054; Outside Erecting Shop: 60154, 76045. Weigh House: D366; Outside Weigh House: 61389. Paint Shop: E3068, D3254, D5050, D5360, D5606, D5822 (Brush 323/61), D9017 (EE2922, V574 of 1961), 60021/162, 62037, 63980, 70013. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
03/12/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3474/7, E3070-6. Stripping Road: 60027, 60138, 63938, 73003. Scrap Road: Nil. Crimpsal: 60157, 61317, 70049, 73035. Outside Crimpsal: 60007, 60103. Boiler Park: 60048, 60109/51. Erecting Shop: D2026, D3153, D3325, D3451/74, D3646 D5520/68/9, D5612/3, D8215, 60029/71, 60149/60, 60523, 61286, 62048,, 63931/56/73, 70008/36/44, 73000/24. Outside Erecting Shop: 60148, 62034. Weigh House: D3478, D5050. Outside Weigh House: 60023, 61042. Paint Shop: D369, D5363, D5825, D9001/18, E3069, 60046, 61107, 63960/81/7, 73054. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196201 |
03/10/1964 | Doncaster MPD (Stored on shed) | Stored on shed: 60125/39/49, 90717, 92169/70/5. | SLS/196411 |
13/12/1964 | Doncaster MPD (Stored) | Stored: 60139/49, 61212, 90469/717, 92169/70/5; Also on shed: 48755(1F), D1519/39/45/56, D1766. | SLS/196501 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/05/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60149 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2068 Allocated to Grantham (GRA) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
20/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/06/1949. Dep: 23/06/1949. | ||
29/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/09/1949. Dep: 10/10/1949. Work undertaken: ATC fitted |
||
10/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
15/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
19/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
25/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
17/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/04/1950. Dep: 18/04/1950. | ||
19/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
18/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1950. Dep: 20/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29807 (Diagram 118) |
||
12/1950 | Naming | Named 'AMADIS' | ||
13/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/07/1951. Dep: 16/08/1951. | ||
09/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
15/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
25/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/03/1952. Dep: 04/04/1952. | ||
30/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1952. Dep: 31/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29822 (Diagram 118) |
||
22/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 22/07/1953. Dep: 22/07/1953. | ||
26/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1953. Dep: 24/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29826 (Diagram 118) |
||
15/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/12/1953. Dep: 22/12/1953. | ||
11/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/01/1955. Dep: 17/01/1955. | ||
29/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1955. Dep: 10/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29785 (Diagram 117) |
||
03/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/05/1956. Dep: 11/05/1956. | ||
23/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1956. Dep: 23/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29870 (Diagram 118) |
||
16/09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
08/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/07/1957. Dep: 10/07/1957. | ||
06/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1958. Dep: 11/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10594 (Diagram 118) |
||
28/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
07/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 07/11/1958. Dep: 07/11/1958. | ||
25/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1959. Dep: 31/12/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29875 (Diagram 118) |
||
31/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/05/1960. Dep: 01/07/1960. | ||
09/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/09/1960. Dep: 18/10/1960. | ||
07/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1961. Dep: 22/12/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29823 (Diagram 118) |
||
11/04/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 11/04/1963. Dep: 11/04/1963. | ||
07/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60149 from Doncaster (36A) |