Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 4179 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34829 Week
» 133474 Month
» 336138 Year
» 3362991 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #2095
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
97 |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
J39 |
2691 |
|
20/07/1928 |
J39 |
2695 |
|
24/03/1933 |
J39 |
2693 |
|
29/10/1935 |
J39 |
2966 |
|
27/08/1938 |
J39 |
2704 |
|
18/01/1941 |
J39 |
2706 |
|
02/10/1943 |
J39 |
1971 |
|
17/06/1946 |
J39 |
64867 |
|
16/10/1948 |
|