|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 02/04/1938 | 14/05/1938 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 03/09/1940 | 08/10/1940 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2922 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/11/1942 | 05/01/1943 | 39 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/01/1944 | 12/02/1944 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 27460 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 08/09/1945 | 06/10/1945 | 29 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/07/1946 | 27/07/1946 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/11/1946 | 09/11/1946 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/09/1948 | 16/10/1948 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2095 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64867 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/09/1951 | 20/10/1951 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27589 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/09/1955 | 22/10/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 27532 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/01/1957 | 09/02/1957 | 30 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 27511 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/02/1959 | 06/03/1959 | 24 days | Light Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/12/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1486 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1653 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
23/01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
02/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1938. Dep: 14/05/1938. | ||
03/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1940. Dep: 08/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2922 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/11/1942. Dep: 05/01/1943. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
08/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1944. Dep: 12/02/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27460 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945. | ||
06/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/07/1946. Dep: 27/07/1946. | ||
02/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/11/1946. Dep: 09/11/1946. | ||
24/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4867 | ||
28/12/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
03/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
09/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1948. Dep: 16/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2095 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64867 |
||
20/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
26/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
10/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Malton (50F) | ||
16/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Malton (50F) | ||
06/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1951. Dep: 20/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27589 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1955. Dep: 22/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27532 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/01/1957. Dep: 09/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27511 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 11/02/1959. Dep: 06/03/1959. | ||
24/02/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64867 from Malton (50F) | ||
08/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |