Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1800 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 27834 Week
» 126479 Month
» 329143 Year
» 3355996 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #8588
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
97 |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
J39 |
2970 |
|
24/12/1931 |
J39 |
2975 |
|
05/05/1934 |
J39 |
2703 |
|
26/12/1936 |
J39 |
2962 |
|
12/05/1939 |
J39 |
1286 |
|
21/11/1942 |
J39 |
1803 |
|
20/07/1945 |
J39 |
64828 |
|
21/08/1948 |
|