|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 26/03/1934 | 21/04/1934 | 27 days | General | Not repaired - sent to Gorton Boiler number 2189 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/07/1936 | 08/08/1936 | 24 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/12/1938 | 14/01/1939 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2296 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/12/1940 | 01/02/1941 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2685 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/02/1944 | 30/03/1944 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2601 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/08/1945 | 27/10/1945 | 59 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/07/1946 | 21/12/1946 | 157 days | General | Boiler number 2216 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4831 |
||
Gorton Works | 09/02/1948 | 21/03/1948 | 42 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 64831 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/05/1949 | 06/08/1949 | 87 days | General | Boiler number 2660 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/08/1949 | 23/08/1949 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 02/01/1952 | 13/02/1952 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 27691 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/11/1954 | 24/12/1954 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 27694 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/01/1955 | 05/01/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 15/01/1958 | 15/02/1958 | 32 days | General | Not repaired Boiler number 27675 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/12/1931 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2970 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1539 Allocated to March (MAR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
26/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1934. Dep: 21/04/1934. Work undertaken: Not repaired - sent to Gorton Boiler number 2189 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/07/1936 | Modification | Diagram 97 number 2094 boiler fitted | ||
16/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1936. Dep: 08/08/1936. | ||
20/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
04/06/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
14/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1938. Dep: 14/01/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2296 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/08/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
06/09/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
28/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1940. Dep: 01/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2685 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1944. Dep: 30/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2601 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1945. Dep: 27/10/1945. | ||
18/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1946. Dep: 21/12/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2216 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4831 |
||
09/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/02/1948. Dep: 21/03/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64831 |
||
12/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1949. Dep: 06/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2660 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/08/1949. Dep: 23/08/1949. | ||
01/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
07/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
02/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1952. Dep: 13/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27691 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1954. Dep: 24/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27694 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/01/1955. Dep: 05/01/1955. | ||
15/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1958. Dep: 15/02/1958. Work undertaken: Not repaired Boiler number 27675 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/05/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
06/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
20/06/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64831 from Hull Dairycoates (50B) |