Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2910 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33560 Week
» 132205 Month
» 334869 Year
» 3361722 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #2097
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
97 |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
J39 |
2693 |
|
20/07/1928 |
J39 |
2700 |
|
20/06/1931 |
J39 |
1282 |
|
21/04/1934 |
J39 |
1268 |
|
12/03/1937 |
J39 |
1286 |
|
11/11/1939 |
J39 |
2971 |
|
27/03/1943 |
J39 |
1997 |
|
12/01/1946 |
|