|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/05/1931 | 20/06/1931 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2097 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/03/1934 | 07/04/1934 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2220 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1934 | 15/09/1934 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 05/03/1937 | 20/03/1937 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 27721 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/01/1940 | 10/02/1940 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 8003 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/11/1942 | 16/01/1943 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 2290 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/08/1945 | 27/10/1945 | 76 days | General | Boiler number 825 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1945 | 06/12/1945 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 18/04/1948 | 04/06/1948 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 822 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64753 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/06/1948 | 28/07/1948 | 30 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 24/02/1951 | 09/05/1951 | 75 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 26/12/1953 | 23/01/1954 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 25808 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/04/1956 | 12/05/1956 | 29 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1945 | Belle Vue MPD | 2700, 2971, 5180/7,5429/30, 5503, 6100, 6031 an 6575 were noted on trials ex Gorton during November. 4665 was noted on a local passenger ex Manchester (London Road). other strangers included 1992 ex G.W. | SLS/194601 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/08/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2700 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1414 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
22/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1931. Dep: 20/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2097 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1934. Dep: 07/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2220 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/08/1934. Dep: 15/09/1934. | ||
15/01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
17/02/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
05/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1937. Dep: 20/03/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27721 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1940. Dep: 10/02/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8003 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1942. Dep: 16/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2290 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1945. Dep: 27/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 825 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/11/1945. Dep: 06/12/1945. | ||
07/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4753 | ||
04/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
18/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1948. Dep: 04/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 822 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64753 |
||
29/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/06/1948. Dep: 28/07/1948. | ||
24/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/02/1951. Dep: 09/05/1951. | ||
26/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/12/1953. Dep: 23/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25808 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/04/1956. Dep: 12/05/1956. | ||
27/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
21/08/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64753 from Gorton (9G) | ||
10/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |