Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2286 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 28320 Week
» 126965 Month
» 329629 Year
» 3356482 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #2223
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
97 |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
J39 |
2730 |
|
17/05/1929 |
J39 |
2727 |
|
25/07/1931 |
J39 |
2776 |
|
24/02/1934 |
J39 |
1281 |
|
07/11/1936 |
J39 |
1453 |
|
22/07/1939 |
J39 |
1458 |
|
11/07/1942 |
J39 |
1563 |
|
21/10/1944 |
J39 |
64925 |
|
19/06/1948 |
|