|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 30/01/1929 | 02/04/1929 | 63 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 15/12/1930 | 28/01/1931 | 45 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1933 | 05/04/1933 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 1907 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1935 | 27/04/1935 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 1920 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 08/03/1937 | 09/04/1937 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2623 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/08/1939 | 02/09/1939 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2277 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/09/1940 | 24/10/1940 | 45 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 10/06/1942 | 11/07/1942 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2223 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 18/09/1944 | 14/10/1944 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 2719 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/09/1946 | 16/11/1946 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 3174 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 29/04/1949 | 28/05/1949 | 30 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/10/1951 | 24/11/1951 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 27593 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/06/1954 | 28/08/1954 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 27710 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/10/1954 | 08/01/1955 | 89 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/12/1957 | 01/02/1958 | 45 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/07/1959 | 22/08/1959 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 25829 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/1926 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1458 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1344 Allocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
30/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1929. Dep: 02/04/1929. | ||
15/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1930. Dep: 28/01/1931. | ||
23/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1933. Dep: 05/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1907 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1935. Dep: 27/04/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1920 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
05/1936 | Modification | Modification: Steam Brakes fitted | ||
05/1936 | Modification | Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed | ||
08/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1937. Dep: 09/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2623 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
10/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1939. Dep: 02/09/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2277 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 10/09/1940. Dep: 24/10/1940. | ||
10/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1942. Dep: 11/07/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2223 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
18/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1944. Dep: 14/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2719 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4709 | ||
21/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1946. Dep: 16/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3174 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
16/11/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 64709 | ||
29/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 29/04/1949. Dep: 28/05/1949. | ||
26/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1951. Dep: 24/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27593 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
28/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1954. Dep: 28/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27710 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/10/1954. Dep: 08/01/1955. | ||
19/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 19/12/1957. Dep: 01/02/1958. | ||
09/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1959. Dep: 22/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25829 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64709 from Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
04/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |