Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Nine Elms
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Nine Elms |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 9E | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 70A | 01/02/1950 | 30/06/1967 |
|
Date Closed |
09/07/1967 |
Big 4 Company |
SR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on a spur off the main L.S.W. line. The yard is not
visible from the line.
Turn right outside Wandsworth Road Station along Wandsworth
Road. Turn left into Brooklands Road. The shed entrance is at the
end of this road. Walking time 15 minutes. See also under London. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 9E | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 70A | 09/07/1967 | Depot closed |
|
|
|