Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1937 |
For | 14 Steam locomotives |
Class | 72xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4202 | 2446 | 72xx | GWR | Collett | 2-8-2T | 28/09/1937 | 08/06/1964 | |
4204 | 2448 | 72xx | GWR | Collett | 2-8-2T | 14/01/1938 | 24/07/1964 | |
4205 | 2449 | 72xx | GWR | Collett | 2-8-2T | 11/05/1938 | 07/09/1964 | |
4209 | 2453 | 72xx | GWR | Collett | 2-8-2T | 25/11/1938 | 16/06/1965 | |
4210 | 2454 | 72xx | GWR | Collett | 2-8-2T | 26/04/1939 | 16/06/1965 | |
4216 | 2460 | 72xx | GWR | Collett | 2-8-2T | 04/03/1938 | 06/02/1965 | |
4219 | 2463 | 72xx | GWR | Collett | 2-8-2T | 28/02/1939 | 28/09/1964 | |
4220 | 2464 | 72xx | GWR | Collett | 2-8-2T | 14/09/1937 | 26/11/1962 | |
4234 | 2589 | 72xx | GWR | Collett | 2-8-2T | 29/07/1938 | 30/09/1963 | |
4239 | 2594 | 72xx | GWR | Collett | 2-8-2T | 08/1937 | 07/09/1964 | |
4240 | 2595 | 72xx | GWR | Collett | 2-8-2T | 21/03/1939 | 06/01/1964 | |
4244 | 2634 | 72xx | GWR | Collett | 2-8-2T | 08/09/1938 | 22/03/1963 | |
4245 | 2635 | 72xx | GWR | Collett | 2-8-2T | 08/12/1939 | 30/04/1965 | |
4249 | 2639 | 72xx | GWR | Collett | 2-8-2T | 12/10/1938 | 16/06/1965 |