Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 42 Online
» 3583 Today
» 4521 Yesterday
» 17872 Week
» 78166 Month
» 538107 Year
» 4977544 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Manufacturer: Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Book
Lot Number |
Order Number |
Order Date |
For |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number Off |
Info |
|
306 |
1866 |
Steam Locomotives |
GSWR |
141 |
0-4-2 |
10 |
|
|
351 |
1869 |
Steam Locomotives |
GSWR |
58 |
0-6-0 |
10 |
|
|
365 |
1870 |
Steam Locomotives |
GSWR |
187 |
0-4-2 |
10 |
|
|
373 |
1871 |
Steam Locomotives |
GSWR |
187 |
0-4-2 |
10 |
|
|
549 |
1882 |
Steam Locomotives |
NBR |
Y9 |
0-4-0ST |
2 |
|
|
E463 |
1877 |
Steam Locomotives |
NBR |
D27 |
4-4-0 |
4 |
|
|
E490 |
1878 |
Steam Locomotives |
GNSR |
D39 |
4-4-0 |
3 |
|
|
E492 |
06/1876 |
Steam Locomotives |
NBR |
D27 |
4-4-0 |
4 |
|
|
E661 |
1890 |
Steam Locomotives |
MSLR |
N4 |
0-6-2T |
35 |
|
|
E683 |
1892 |
Steam Locomotives |
MSLR |
N4 |
0-6-2T |
14 |
GCR Class 9A Alterered (extended) |
|
E711 |
1893 |
Steam Locomotives |
GNSR |
D41 |
4-4-0 |
6 |
|
|
E747 |
1895 |
Steam Locomotives |
GNSR |
D41 |
4-4-0 |
14 |
|
|
E761 |
1896 |
Steam Locomotives |
MGNR |
J40 |
0-6-0 |
8 |
|
|
E787 |
1897 |
Steam Locomotives |
GNSR |
D41 |
4-4-0 |
12 |
|
|
E827 |
1899 |
Steam Locomotives |
GNSR |
D40 |
4-4-0 |
5 |
|
|
E833 |
1900 |
Steam Locomotives |
GSWR |
361 |
0-6-0 |
20 |
|
|
E884 |
01/1902 |
Steam Locomotives |
GCR |
B5 |
4-6-0 |
6 |
|
|
M8238/b |
04/05/1875 |
Steam Locomotives |
BR |
|
|
20 |
|
|
M8275/c |
01/06/1875 |
Steam Locomotives |
BR |
|
|
10 |
|
|
Unknown |
1867 |
Steam Locomotives |
GSWR |
58 |
0-6-0 |
10 |
|
|
Unknown |
1883 |
Steam Locomotives |
GSWR |
22 |
0-6-0 |
10 |
|
|
Unknown |
1874 |
Steam Locomotives |
GSWR |
221 |
0-4-2 |
10 |
|
|
Unknown |
1875 |
Steam Locomotives |
GSWR |
221 |
0-4-2 |
10 |
|
|
Unknown |
1875 |
Steam Locomotives |
GSWR |
221 |
0-4-2 |
10 |
|
|
Unknown |
1877 |
Steam Locomotives |
GSWR |
221 |
0-4-2 |
10 |
|
|
Unknown |
1878 |
Steam Locomotives |
GSWR |
221 |
0-4-2 |
10 |
|
|
Unknown |
1893 |
Steam Locomotives |
GSWR |
326 |
0-4-4T |
10 |
|
|
Unknown |
05/1892 |
Steam Locomotives |
HR |
Strath |
4-4-0 |
12 |
|
|
Unknown |
1880 |
Steam Locomotives |
MCR |
15 |
0-4-0T |
1 |
|
|
Unknown |
1881 |
Steam Locomotives |
MCR |
15 |
0-4-0T |
1 |
|
|
Unknown |
1876 |
Steam Locomotives |
CR |
502 |
0-4-0ST |
14 |
|
|
Unknown |
1881 |
Steam Locomotives |
CR |
486 |
0-6-0ST |
6 |
|
|
Unknown |
1886 |
Steam Locomotives |
CR |
123 |
4-2-2 |
1 |
|
|
Unknown |
1884 |
Steam Locomotives |
CR |
66 |
4-4-0 |
10 |
|
|
Unknown |
1883 |
Steam Locomotives |
CR |
294 |
0-6-0 |
15 |
|
|
Unknown |
1884 |
Steam Locomotives |
CR |
294 |
0-6-0 |
20 |
|
|
Unknown |
1899 |
Steam Locomotives |
CR |
812 |
0-6-0 |
20 |
|
|
Unknown |
07/1883 |
Steam Locomotives |
LYR |
629 |
4-4-0 |
20 |
|
|
Unknown |
04/1884 |
Steam Locomotives |
LYR |
629 |
4-4-0 |
10 |
|
|
Unknown |
1891 |
Steam Locomotives |
NBR |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
15 |
|
|
Unknown |
1891 |
Steam Locomotives |
GCR |
J9 |
0-6-0 |
25 |
|
|
Unknown |
1881 |
Steam Locomotives |
MR |
1400 |
2-4-0 |
30 |
|
|
Unknown |
1901 |
Steam Locomotives |
MR |
60 |
4-4-0 |
10 |
|
|
Unknown |
1874 |
Steam Locomotives |
MR |
1102 |
0-6-0T |
10 |
|
|
Unknown |
1875 |
Steam Locomotives |
MR |
1102 |
0-6-0T |
15 |
|
|
Unknown |
11/10/1899 |
Steam Locomotives |
SECR |
G |
4-4-0 |
5 |
Identical to Pickersgill's Great North of Scotland 4-4-0's. An order for 10 of these machines proved too much for the finances of the GNoSR, and 5 were sold brand new to the SECR. |
|
Unknown |
1896 |
Steam Locomotives |
GNR |
J53 |
0-6-0ST |
15 |
|
|
Unknown |
1897 |
Steam Locomotives |
GNR |
J53 |
0-6-0ST |
5 |
|
|
Unknown |
03/08/1883 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
460 |
4-4-0 |
10 |
|
|
Unknown |
04/08/1883 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
Radial Tanks |
4-4-2T |
11 |
|
|
Unknown |
1900 |
Steam Locomotives |
NBR |
J83 |
0-6-0T |
20 |
|
|
Unknown |
15/04/1892 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
Jubilee |
0-4-2 |
40 |
|
|
Unknown |
1890 |
Steam Locomotives |
MSLR |
F1 |
2-4-2T |
15 |
|
|
Unknown |
1892 |
Steam Locomotives |
MSLR |
F1 |
2-4-2T |
12 |
|
|
Unknown |
1893 |
Steam Locomotives |
GNSR |
G10 |
0-4-4T |
9 |
|
|
Unknown |
1879 |
Steam Locomotives |
NBR |
D50 |
4-4-0T |
3 |
|
|
Unknown |
1874 |
Steam Locomotives |
NER |
G6 |
0-4-4T |
12 |
|
|
Unknown |
1891 |
Steam Locomotives |
LNER |
J54 |
0-6-0T |
10 |
|
|
Unknown |
1901 |
Steam Locomotives |
GCR |
J11 |
0-6-0 |
40 |
|
|
Unknown |
1902 |
Steam Locomotives |
GCR |
J11 |
0-6-0 |
9 |
|
|
Unknown |
|
Steam Locomotives |
SECR |
C |
0-6-0 |
15 |
|