Manufacturer: Horwich Works
Builder | Horwich Works |
Order Date | 1949 |
For | 30 Steam locomotives |
Class | 5MT |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
44668 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 24/12/1949 | 09/04/1966 | ||
44669 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/12/1949 | 14/10/1967 | ||
44670 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/01/1950 | 15/01/1966 | ||
44671 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 28/02/1950 | 18/02/1967 | ||
44672 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 28/02/1950 | 02/03/1968 | ||
44673 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 28/02/1950 | 15/05/1965 | ||
44674 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/03/1950 | 30/12/1967 | ||
44675 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/03/1950 | 23/09/1967 | ||
44676 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 30/04/1950 | 04/07/1964 | ||
44677 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 30/04/1950 | 28/10/1967 | ||
44678 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/05/1950 | 25/11/1967 | ||
44679 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/05/1950 | 23/09/1967 | ||
44680 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 30/06/1950 | 16/09/1967 | ||
44681 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 17/06/1950 | 16/09/1967 | ||
44682 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 17/06/1950 | 11/1967 | ||
44683 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/07/1950 | 13/04/1968 | ||
44684 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/07/1950 | 16/09/1967 | ||
44685 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/08/1950 | 22/04/1967 | ||
44686 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 30/04/1951 | 16/10/1965 | ||
44687 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/05/1951 | 22/01/1966 | ||
44688 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/08/1950 | 20/08/1966 | ||
44689 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 30/09/1950 | 04/03/1967 | ||
44690 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/10/1950 | 03/08/1968 | ||
44691 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/10/1950 | 01/04/1967 | ||
44692 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 31/10/1950 | 14/05/1966 | ||
44693 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1950 | 29/05/1967 | ||
44694 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1950 | 10/1967 | ||
44695 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 30/11/1950 | 24/06/1967 | ||
44696 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 30/11/1950 | 13/05/1967 | ||
44697 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 30/11/1950 | 18/11/1967 |