Manufacturer: Horwich Works
Builder | Horwich Works |
Order Date | 1947 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 5MT |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4783 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1947 | 05/1964 | ||
4784 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1947 | 06/1964 | ||
4785 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1947 | 29/06/1964 | ||
4786 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1947 | 17/08/1966 | ||
4787 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1947 | 22/11/1965 | ||
4788 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1947 | 29/11/1966 | ||
4789 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1947 | 10/12/1964 | ||
4790 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1947 | 18/03/1967 | ||
4791 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1947 | 29/11/1966 | ||
4792 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 07/1947 | 23/09/1967 | ||
4793 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1947 | 10/12/1964 | ||
4794 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1947 | 22/04/1967 | ||
4795 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1947 | 29/07/1967 | ||
4796 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1947 | 01/05/1967 | ||
4797 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1947 | 02/09/1966 | ||
4798 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1947 | 02/09/1966 | ||
4799 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1947 | 03/07/1965 | ||
4997 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1947 | 01/05/1967 | ||
4998 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1947 | 04/04/1967 | ||
4999 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1947 | 02/09/1966 |