Manufacturer: Horwich Works
Builder | Horwich Works |
Order Date | 1945 |
For | 35 Steam locomotives |
Class | 5MT |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4932 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1945 | 03/08/1968 | ||
4933 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1945 | 14/10/1967 | ||
4934 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1945 | 30/09/1967 | ||
4935 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1945 | 15/10/1966 | ||
4936 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1945 | 12/08/1967 | ||
4937 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1945 | 13/05/1967 | ||
4938 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1945 | 14/10/1967 | ||
4939 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1945 | 12/1965 | ||
4940 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1945 | 16/03/1968 | ||
4941 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1945 | 12/11/1966 | ||
4942 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1945 | 22/06/1968 | ||
4943 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1945 | 10/1967 | ||
4944 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1946 | 16/09/1967 | ||
4945 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1946 | 29/10/1966 | ||
4946 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1946 | 22/05/1967 | ||
4947 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1946 | 29/06/1968 | ||
4948 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1946 | 16/09/1967 | ||
4949 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1946 | 29/06/1968 | ||
4950 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1946 | 03/08/1968 | ||
4951 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1946 | 14/12/1966 | ||
4952 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1946 | 19/10/1966 | ||
4953 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1946 | 10/12/1966 | ||
4954 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1946 | 23/09/1966 | ||
4955 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1946 | 07/1965 | ||
4956 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1946 | 14/06/1966 | ||
4957 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1946 | 05/1964 | ||
4958 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1946 | 04/03/1967 | ||
4959 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1946 | 10/07/1965 | ||
4960 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1946 | 17/01/1966 | ||
4961 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 15/06/1946 | 29/06/1964 | ||
4962 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 15/06/1946 | 30/12/1967 | ||
4963 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 22/06/1946 | 20/07/1968 | ||
4964 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 07/1946 | 14/10/1967 | ||
4965 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1946 | 04/1968 | ||
4966 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1946 | 17/09/1966 |