|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 10/10/1923 | 13/12/1923 | 65 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 08/03/1926 | 29/06/1926 | 114 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 12/07/1929 | 25/09/1929 | 76 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 19/06/1931 | 20/07/1931 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 09/09/1932 | 19/10/1932 | 41 days | General | Boiler number E4/42 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/12/1935 | 05/02/1936 | 59 days | General | Boiler number AW47 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1939 | 17/08/1939 | 39 days | General | Boiler number AW26 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/01/1940 | 26/03/1940 | 65 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 14/01/1942 | 07/02/1942 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2819 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1944 | 01/07/1944 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 2439 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 07/12/1945 | 22/12/1945 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 19/12/1946 | 20/02/1947 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 2976 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/03/1947 | 12/04/1947 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 02/08/1948 | 10/08/1948 | 9 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63393 |
||
Darlington Works | 27/09/1949 | 15/10/1949 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 24230 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/10/1949 | 21/10/1949 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/04/1952 | 03/05/1952 | 25 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 05/05/1952 | 10/05/1952 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 27/07/1954 | 08/09/1954 | 44 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 08/08/1955 | 30/09/1955 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 24174 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 22/04/1958 | 30/05/1958 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 24211 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/02/1959 | 23/02/1959 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 28/08/1959 | 02/10/1959 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1961 | 05/01/1962 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 24324 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1962 | 06/02/1962 | 15 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/09/1964 | Darlington Works (Yard) | New Engine Shop: D3940, 12116, tender of 60530. Main Erecting shop: 60530 Sayajirao, 60844, 61214, 61330, 62059, 73095, 73132, 76095/9, 93368/610, D2246/72, D3657. Yard Paint shop: 60118 Archibald Sturrock. Yard: 43008 an 62041 being painted, 60522 Straight Deal, 60145 Saint Mungo, 60011 frames only, 61038 without nameplates, 61084, 63393, 65033/99, 43123, 44734, 68062, D2700, 90407; North Rd. scrap yard: 61229, 61321 and tender of 60020. | SLS/196410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1918 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2236 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
10/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1923. Dep: 13/12/1923. | ||
08/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1926. Dep: 29/06/1926. | ||
12/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1929. Dep: 25/09/1929. | ||
19/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/06/1931. Dep: 20/07/1931. | ||
09/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1932. Dep: 19/10/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/42 (Diagram 50) |
||
09/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1935. Dep: 05/02/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number AW47 (Diagram 50) |
||
10/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1939. Dep: 17/08/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number AW26 (Diagram 50) |
||
22/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/01/1940. Dep: 26/03/1940. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
14/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1942. Dep: 07/02/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2819 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
06/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1944. Dep: 01/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2439 (Diagram 50) |
||
07/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/12/1945. Dep: 22/12/1945. | ||
15/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3393 | ||
19/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1946. Dep: 20/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2976 (Diagram 50A) |
||
29/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/03/1947. Dep: 12/04/1947. | ||
02/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/08/1948. Dep: 10/08/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63393 |
||
27/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1949. Dep: 15/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24230 (Diagram 50) |
||
17/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/10/1949. Dep: 21/10/1949. | ||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
09/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/04/1952. Dep: 03/05/1952. | ||
05/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/05/1952. Dep: 10/05/1952. | ||
27/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 27/07/1954. Dep: 08/09/1954. | ||
08/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1955. Dep: 30/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24174 (Diagram 50A) |
||
22/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1958. Dep: 30/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24211 (Diagram 50A) |
||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
17/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/02/1959. Dep: 23/02/1959. | ||
28/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/08/1959. Dep: 02/10/1959. | ||
27/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1961. Dep: 05/01/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24324 (Diagram 50A) |
||
23/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/01/1962. Dep: 06/02/1962. | ||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
17/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63393 from Tyne Dock (52H) |