Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1794 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 27828 Week
» 126473 Month
» 329137 Year
» 3355990 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3815 |
m/e |
11/1936 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1975 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
61975 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1684 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 04/09/1961 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 10 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
13/10/1956 |
ALLOC |
38B |
Annesley |
3w/e |
01/12/1956 |
LOAN |
16D |
Annesley |
on |
01/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
16D |
Annesley |
on |
23/02/1958 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
LOAN |
56B |
Ardsley |
4w/e |
16/05/1959 |
ALLOC |
91NE |
|
4w/e |
30/05/1959 |
ALLOC |
56F |
Low Moor |
5w/e |
08/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/09/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3815 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1684 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1975 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Annesley (ANN) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61975 |
|
|
22/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
15/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
16/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
04/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61975 |
|
|