|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/03/1961 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2388/9, E3059-64. Stripping Road: D2402, D3489, 13252, 60040, 61144, 61227, 61828, 62013, 63954, 68522, 68869/90, 68916, 69572; Scrap Yard: 64729/87, with 64746, 68875, 68979, 69586 being cut-up. Crimpsall: 60047/90, 61066, 62061. Outside Crimpsall: 60026, 60532, 61971. Erecting Shop: 13326, D3452, D5564, D8214, D9002, 43092, 43151, 60014/28/53/8, 60102/33/8, 61066/73, 61819/32/43/89, 61939, 62009, 63949/68, 70039, 76032. Outside Erecting Shop: D2400, 60128, 68925. Weigh House: D336. Outside Weigh House: 61950. Paint Shop: D320/37, D2387, D5690/1, D6712, D9000, E3058, 60041, 60118/36, 60529, 61835, 73096. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196105 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1925 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 121 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1260 |
||
04/1933 | Modification | Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted | ||
06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1835 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) | ||
09/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
25/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
22/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
01/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61835 | ||
24/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
10/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
17/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
23/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
21/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61835 |