Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1871 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 27905 Week
» 126550 Month
» 329214 Year
» 3356067 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2085 |
m/e |
11/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7314 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
67314 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
G5 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
A281 |
To Service |
During 11/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 12/12/1955 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 1 mth , 11 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1900 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2085 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
08/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7314 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - West Hartlepool (WHL) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67314 |
|
|
25/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
20/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northallerton (51J) |
|
|
24/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
12/12/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67314 |
|
|