|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1946 | General | At this date (30/11/1946) only the following Scottish Area engines still require to be renumbered: 4488, 4491, 2745, 4819, 4891, 4898, 3658, 3682, 3692, 1996, 9765, 6897, 3057, 9499, 9886, 9384, 6398, 6399, 6401, 265, 320, 9201, 9204, 9368, 9255, 9263, 9429, 9046, 2980, 9632, 9644, 9668, 9757, 9790, 7348, 9524, 9527; a total of 37, or 3 per cent. of the total stock | SLS/194701 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/12/1927 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 265, name: LANARKSHIRE Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1384 |
||
01/1931 | Modification | Modification: Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector | ||
12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2705 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Haymarket (HAY) | ||
15/05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 62705 | ||
30/11/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62705 | ||
01/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |