Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 519 Today
» 1013 Yesterday
» 519 Week
» 18571 Month
» 251491 Year
» 1916867 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3557 03/11/1958  
TOPS (Tops) 08442 12/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0803/11/1958
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 03/11/1958 to Bathgate (64F)
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
64F Bathgate (New) on 03/11/1958
64E Polmont 4w/e 20/12/1958
65F Grangemouth 4w/e 25/01/1964
AY Ayr on 03/08/1981


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
03/11/1958 To Service To service as British Railways Number 3557
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Bathgate (64F)
   
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Polmont (64E)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F)    
12/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08442    

prev prev