Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 33 Online
» 1693 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 27727 Week
» 126372 Month
» 329036 Year
» 3355889 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13302 |
20/04/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3302 |
21/02/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08232 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/04/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
20/04/1956 |
Power Unit IH3490 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/04/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13302 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
21/02/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3302 |
|
|
14/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
30/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08232 |
|
|
26/09/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08232 from Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
07/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|