Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1349 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31999 Week
» 130644 Month
» 333308 Year
» 3360161 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7669 |
25/03/1967 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25319 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
25/03/1967 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/03/1967 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/03/1967 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7669 Built at Derby Works Allocated to London Division (D01) Livery applied: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
06/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
08/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25319 |
|
|
20/03/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25319 |
|
|
12/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|