Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3769 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34419 Week
» 133064 Month
» 335728 Year
» 3362581 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7647 |
30/03/1966 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25297 |
15/12/1973 |
|
TOPS (25/9) |
25907 |
26/11/1985 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
30/03/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
12/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/03/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
02/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
12/1973 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/03/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7647 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd. Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
10/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
07/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
07/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
09/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
02/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
12/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
15/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25297 |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
26/11/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25907 |
|
|
01/09/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25907 |
|
|
06/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|