Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 1791 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32441 Week
» 131086 Month
» 333750 Year
» 3360603 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7620 |
26/08/1966 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25270 |
06/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
26/08/1966 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/08/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
02/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/08/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7620 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Eastfield (65A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
31/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
02/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25270 |
|
|
08/06/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
28/11/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25270 |
|
|
30/06/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|