Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 583 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 13989 Week
» 67005 Month
» 186532 Year
» 3213385 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5142 |
19/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24142 |
04/1974 |
|
Departmental (Dept) |
TDB968009 |
08/1976 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4610 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
19/11/1960 to Longsight (9A) |
Withdrawn |
01/07/1976 |
Time in Service |
15 yrs, 7 mths , 12 dys |
Cut Up |
09/1984 |
Cut At |
Coopers Metals (Sheffield) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
19/11/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 05/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1972 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/11/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
03/1972 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5142 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Longsight (9A) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
27/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
10/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
24/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
07/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
28/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
03/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24142 |
|
|
28/02/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
01/07/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24142 |
|
|
08/1976 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to TDB968009 |
|
|
09/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Coopers Metals: Sheffield |
|
|