Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1453 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14859 Week
» 67875 Month
» 187402 Year
» 3214255 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5141 |
12/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24141 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4610 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
12/11/1960 to Longsight (9A) |
Withdrawn |
17/07/1976 |
Time in Service |
15 yrs, 8 mths , 5 dys |
Cut Up |
06/1978 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
12/11/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
02/1972 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/11/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
02/1972 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5141 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Longsight (9A) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
03/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
01/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
02/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24141 |
|
|
28/02/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
17/07/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24141 |
|
|
06/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|