Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 359 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18162 Week
» 71178 Month
» 190705 Year
» 3217558 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5133 |
24/09/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24133 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4610 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
24/09/1960 to Longsight (9A) |
Withdrawn |
12/03/1978 |
Time in Service |
17 yrs, 5 mths , 16 dys |
Cut Up |
09/1978 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
24/09/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/09/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
15/07/1964 |
Severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/09/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5133 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Longsight (9A) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
12/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
24/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
26/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12C) |
|
|
07/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
07/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
26/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
01/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24133 |
|
|
12/03/1978 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24133 |
|
|
09/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|