Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 322 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18125 Week
» 71141 Month
» 190668 Year
» 3217521 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5120 |
04/06/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24120 |
07/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4610 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
04/06/1960 to Inverness (60A) |
Withdrawn |
31/12/1976 |
Time in Service |
16 yrs, 6 mths , 27 dys |
Cut Up |
08/1977 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
04/06/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 10/1970 |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
60A |
|
Inverness (New) |
on |
04/06/1960 |
HA |
|
Haymarket |
4w/e |
25/10/1975 |
|
|
Stored |
m/e |
10/1976 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
31/12/1976 |
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/06/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
30/09/1963 |
Not severe |
None |
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Evidence points to sparks ignited oily deposits on fuel tank. |
Clachnaharry |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5120 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Inverness (60A) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
07/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24120 |
|
|
25/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
10/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
31/12/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24120 |
|
|
08/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|