Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2064 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19867 Week
» 72883 Month
» 192410 Year
» 3219263 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5102 |
16/07/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24102 |
23/11/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4610 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
16/07/1960 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
02/02/1976 |
Time in Service |
15 yrs, 6 mths , 17 dys |
Cut Up |
04/1978 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
16/07/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
52A |
|
Gateshead (New) |
on |
16/07/1960 |
IS |
|
Inverness |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
|
|
Stored |
4w/e |
25/10/1975 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/02/1976 |
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/1967 |
|
Air compressor fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1967 |
|
High level air pipe fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1967 |
|
Water tanks removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1967 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/07/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1967 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
16/07/1960 |
Power Unit VA198 |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
26/07/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
18/12/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/07/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5102 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
06/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Air compressor fitted |
|
|
06/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: High level air pipe fitted |
|
|
06/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
06/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Water tanks removed |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
23/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24102 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
25/10/1975 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
02/02/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24102 |
|
|
04/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|