Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1001 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18804 Week
» 71820 Month
» 191347 Year
» 3218200 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5088 |
13/06/1960 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4610 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
13/06/1960 to Cricklewood East (14A) |
Withdrawn |
27/06/1970 |
Time in Service |
10 yrs , 14 dys |
Cut Up |
01/1972 |
Cut At |
Cohens (Kettering) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
13/06/1960 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/06/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
19/10/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
30/04/1970 |
Severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5088 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
06/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
27/06/1970 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5088 |
|
|
01/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|