Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1025 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18828 Week
» 71844 Month
» 191371 Year
» 3218224 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5084 |
25/04/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24084 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4610 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
25/04/1960 to March (31B) |
Withdrawn |
17/07/1976 |
Time in Service |
16 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys |
Cut Up |
12/1978 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
25/04/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/04/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
06/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/04/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5084 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
17/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
13/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
06/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24084 |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
17/07/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24084 |
|
|
12/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|