Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 3088 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17131 Week
» 82085 Month
» 284749 Year
» 3311602 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5080 |
01/03/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24080 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4610 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
01/03/1960 to March (31B) |
Withdrawn |
22/09/1976 |
Time in Service |
16 yrs, 6 mths , 21 dys |
Cut Up |
16/06/1978* *Official list from Doncaster Works |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
01/03/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/03/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
06/03/1970 |
Severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
Freight working |
|
06/09/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/03/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5080 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
02/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
09/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
10/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
17/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24080 |
|
|
22/09/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24080 |
|
|
06/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|