Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 4128 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17534 Week
» 70550 Month
» 190077 Year
» 3216930 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5074 |
14/03/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24074 |
05/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4610 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
14/03/1960 to March (31B) |
Withdrawn |
04/10/1975 |
Time in Service |
15 yrs, 6 mths , 20 dys |
Cut Up |
05/1976 |
Cut At |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
14/03/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/03/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
07/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/03/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5074 Built at Derby Works Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
02/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Watford (1C) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
10/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
07/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24074 |
|
|
04/10/1975 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24074 |
|
|
05/1976 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|