Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3112 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16518 Week
» 69534 Month
» 189061 Year
» 3215914 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5069 |
01/01/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24069 |
05/01/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4610 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
01/01/1960 to March (31B) |
Withdrawn |
01/12/1976 |
Time in Service |
16 yrs , 11 mths |
Cut Up |
09/1977 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
01/01/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/01/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/01/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5069 Built at Derby Works Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
17/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
07/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
13/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24069 |
|
|
23/08/1975 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
03/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
02/10/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
01/12/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24069 |
|
|
09/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|