Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 552 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 13958 Week
» 66974 Month
» 186501 Year
» 3213354 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5060 |
02/01/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24060 |
05/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4610 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
02/01/1960 to March (31B) |
Withdrawn |
04/10/1975 |
Time in Service |
15 yrs, 9 mths , 2 dys |
Cut Up |
01/1977 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
02/01/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 09/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/01/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
20/03/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/01/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5060 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
29/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
12/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
12/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
11/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
18/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
01/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
15/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
09/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24060 |
|
|
04/10/1975 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24060 |
|
|
01/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|