Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1470 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14876 Week
» 67892 Month
» 187419 Year
» 3214272 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3979 |
16/07/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08811 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/07/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/07/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3979 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
13/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08811 |
|
|
25/09/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (AF) |
|
|
29/08/1997 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Old Oak Common TMD |
|
|
29/08/1997 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08811 from Stratford (SF) |
|
|