|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
18/07/1959 | Horsham MPD (Three Bridges) | Horsham closed from 18th July and duties and engines shared between Brighton (30047/8/9/50/1) and Three Bridges (30544/5/6/7, 32463/9/70, 32522/6/41). Shunting is performed by a Guildford 350 H.P. Diesel. | SLS/195909 |
04/11/1961 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D5000/3, D6530, E5008, 3733, 7782, 9629/77, 15211/34, 30051/7, 30480, 30543/7, 30830, 30921, 31808, 32343, 33028/33/40, 34015/49/57/63, 34103/10, 35010/27, 41206, 41324, 73020, 76059, 80145, 82013. Works Yard: 9732, 15233, 30120, 30859/, 34037/50/99, 76060/8, 92211. Scrap Yard: 30277, 30858, 31145, 31505. | SLS/196112 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1939 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 547 Built at Eastleigh Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED) | ||
01/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Three Bridges (3B ) | ||
03/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwood Junction (NORW) | ||
08/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 30547 | ||
10/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Horsham (75D) | ||
18/07/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) | ||
05/01/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 30547 | ||
07/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |